TN HB0928 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 50-14)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises the use of student growth data for purposes of a teacher's or principal's annual evaluation; deletes obsolete provisions regarding the use of student growth data; excludes, for the 2018-2019 and 2019-2020 school years, student growth evaluation composites generated by assessments administered in the 2017-2018 school year if the exclusion results in a higher evaluation score for the teacher. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises the use of student growth data for purposes of a teacher's or principal's annual evaluation; deletes obsolete provisions regarding the use of student growth data; excludes, for the 2018-2019 and 2019-2020 school years, student growth evaluation composites generated by assessments administered in the 2017-2018 school year if the exclusion results in a higher evaluation score for the teacher. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-02-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 2/27/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0784 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback