TN SB0784 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the use of student growth data for purposes of a teacher's or principal's annual evaluation; deletes obsolete provisions regarding the use of student growth data; excludes, for the 2018-2019 and 2019-2020 school years, student growth evaluation composites generated by assessments administered in the 2017-2018 school year if the exclusion results in a higher evaluation score for the teacher. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.
Title
As enacted, revises the use of student growth data for purposes of a teacher's or principal's annual evaluation; deletes obsolete provisions regarding the use of student growth data; excludes, for the 2018-2019 and 2019-2020 school years, student growth evaluation composites generated by assessments administered in the 2017-2018 school year if the exclusion results in a higher evaluation score for the teacher. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Pub. Ch. 42 | |
2019-04-03 | Effective date(s) 03/22/2019 | |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0928 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 42