TN HB0909 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
Pending: House Criminal Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Elderly and Vulnerable Adult Protection Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Elderly and Vulnerable Adult Protection Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1039 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback