TN HB0878 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, grants county officers designated as certified public administrators a one-time annual payment of $1,500 as an educational incentive payment instead of a payment of $375 that increases annually until it reaches $1,500 and removes the requirement that these funds are subject to the annual appropriations act. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 8, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, grants county officers designated as certified public administrators a one-time annual payment of $1,500 as an educational incentive payment instead of a payment of $375 that increases annually until it reaches $1,500 and removes the requirement that these funds are subject to the annual appropriations act. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 8, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-03-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1348 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013