TN SB1348 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, grants county officers designated as certified public administrators a one-time annual payment of $1,500 as an educational incentive payment instead of a payment of $375 that increases annually until it reaches $1,500 and removes the requirement that these funds are subject to the annual appropriations act. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 8, Chapter 24.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, grants county officers designated as certified public administrators a one-time annual payment of $1,500 as an educational incentive payment instead of a payment of $375 that increases annually until it reaches $1,500 and removes the requirement that these funds are subject to the annual appropriations act. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 8, Chapter 24.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-10 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
2013-04-17SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013
2013-04-16SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013
2013-04-16SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013
2013-04-15SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013
2013-04-12SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013
2013-04-10SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
2013-04-02SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/9/2013
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
2013-02-25SenateP2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-02-21SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-02-14SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0878 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback