TN HB0876 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases penalty from Class A misdemeanor to Class E felony for violation of an order of protection, possession of a firearm while subject to an order of protection, and conviction for a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, increases penalty from Class A misdemeanor to Class E felony for violation of an order of protection, possession of a firearm while subject to an order of protection, and conviction for a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-01-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1139 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee