TN SB1139 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases penalty from Class A misdemeanor to Class E felony for violation of an order of protection, possession of a firearm while subject to an order of protection, and conviction for a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, increases penalty from Class A misdemeanor to Class E felony for violation of an order of protection, possession of a firearm while subject to an order of protection, and conviction for a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0876 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee