TN HB0857 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 18 to 19 years, the minimum age someone must be for the commissioner to be authorized to approve the individual's application for an insurance producer license. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to producer licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0834 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee