TN HB0857 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the issuance of a certificate of voting rights restoration to a person who was convicted of an infamous crime in this state and received a pardon, was discharged from custody after serving or expiration of the maximum sentence imposed for the crime, or was granted a certificate of final discharge from supervision by the board of parole or county correction authority; requires the person to have paid all restitution to any victim and all court costs prior to receiving a certificate of voting rights restoration. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Title
As introduced, requires the issuance of a certificate of voting rights restoration to a person who was convicted of an infamous crime in this state and received a pardon, was discharged from custody after serving or expiration of the maximum sentence imposed for the crime, or was granted a certificate of final discharge from supervision by the board of parole or county correction authority; requires the person to have paid all restitution to any victim and all court costs prior to receiving a certificate of voting rights restoration. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1298 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee