TN HB0838 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the mandatory compensation increase for county officers; updates county officer minimum salaries to the 2020-2021 fiscal year amounts. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 24.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 24, relative to county officials.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2021-03-30 | House | Failed in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0848 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee