TN SB0848 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the mandatory compensation increase for county officers; updates county officer minimum salaries to the 2020-2021 fiscal year amounts. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 24.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 24, relative to county officials.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0838 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee