TN HB0835 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to AOC
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to AOC
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the civil justice reform commission to study possible reforms to increase access to the civil justice system; requires the commission to report findings and recommendations to the judiciary committee of the senate, the civil justice committee of the house, the governor, and the supreme court by January 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 19; Title 20; Title 21; Title 22; Title 24 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, creates the civil justice reform commission to study possible reforms to increase access to the civil justice system; requires the commission to report findings and recommendations to the judiciary committee of the senate, the civil justice committee of the house, the governor, and the supreme court by January 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 19; Title 20; Title 21; Title 22; Title 24 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to AOC |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Ref. to Study Subcommittee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0768 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0835&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0835.pdf |