TN HB0804 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits parents called to active military service that requires them to be out of state for more than 90 days to petition the court to temporarily assign their visitation rights during their absence to another relative approved by the court. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, permits parents called to active military service that requires them to be out of state for more than 90 days to petition the court to temporarily assign their visitation rights during their absence to another relative approved by the court. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Pub. Ch. 442 | |
2009-06-30 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-12 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-10 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-09 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 88, Nays 5 | |
2009-06-09 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 6/9/09 | |
2009-06-09 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 21, Nays 5 | |
2009-06-09 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2009-06-09 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-04-02 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-03-30 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 74, Nays 21 | |
2009-03-30 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0108) | |
2009-03-30 | Am. failed no. 3 Ayes 45, Nays 50 | |
2009-03-30 | H. adopted am. no. 1 | |
2009-03-30 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 of 1 - HA0109) | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/26/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 3/18/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 3/11/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Children & Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 02/24/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Family Justice of C&FA | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Children & Family Affairs | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1267 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 442