TN SB1267 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits parents called to active military service that requires them to be out of state for more than 90 days to petition the court to temporarily assign their visitation rights during their absence to another relative approved by the court. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, permits parents called to active military service that requires them to be out of state for more than 90 days to petition the court to temporarily assign their visitation rights during their absence to another relative approved by the court. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 442 | |
2009-06-09 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-06-08 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-08 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/9/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | S. Reset on cal. for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/4/2009 | |
2009-06-01 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0804 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 442