TN HB0780 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes affecting certain professional boards and professions, including court reporters, motor vehicle dealers, barbers, certain apprentices, scrap metal dealers, locksmiths, and other professions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 20; Title 47; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 20; Title 47; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 68, relative to regulated professions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 549 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0771 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021, 10/01/2021