TN SB0771 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021, 10/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021, 10/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes affecting certain professional boards and professions, including court reporters, motor vehicle dealers, barbers, certain apprentices, scrap metal dealers, locksmiths, and other professions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 20; Title 47; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 20; Title 47; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62 and Title 68, relative to regulated professions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 05/26/2021, 10/01/2021 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 549 | |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0053) |
2021-05-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0408) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0780 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 549