TN HB0734 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the ASD, or the entity under contract to operate schools within the ASD, to hire teachers assigned to the school, if the teachers are rated in the two highest categories of teacher evaluations; requires the ASD, or entity under contract to operate the school, to hire no more than 30 percent of the school's teachers from this group. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, requires the ASD, or the entity under contract to operate schools within the ASD, to hire teachers assigned to the school, if the teachers are rated in the two highest categories of teacher evaluations; requires the ASD, or entity under contract to operate the school, to hire no more than 30 percent of the school's teachers from this group. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. David Shepard [D] |
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0142 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0734&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0734.pdf |