TN HB0719 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 405
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 405
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires longevity pay for eligible state employees who previously worked for health departments of home rule municipalities; establishes eligibility criteria. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 23.
Title
As enacted, requires longevity pay for eligible state employees who previously worked for health departments of home rule municipalities; establishes eligibility criteria. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 23.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 405 | |
2011-05-21 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-20 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0546 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 405