TN HB0710 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 979
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 979
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a licensed cosmetologist, manicurist, aesthetician, or natural hair stylist to practice such occupations in a recipient's residence, short-term residence, or place of business. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a licensed cosmetologist, manicurist, aesthetician, or natural hair stylist to practice such occupations in a recipient's residence, short-term residence, or place of business. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Ron Lollar [R] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 979 | |
2018-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0797 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 979