TN HB0705 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, corrects reference to the board of trustees of the consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 1; Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 3; Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 27.
Title
As introduced, corrects reference to the board of trustees of the consolidated retirement system. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 1; Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 3; Title 8, Chapter 25, Part 27.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-10 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1006 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-10 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0705&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0705.pdf |