TN HB0673 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits the tort liability of certain contractors with the state who provide direct client services on behalf of the departments of children's services, mental health and substance abuse services, and intellectual and developmental disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9, Chapter 8 and Title 12.
Title
As introduced, limits the tort liability of certain contractors with the state who provide direct client services on behalf of the departments of children's services, mental health and substance abuse services, and intellectual and developmental disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9, Chapter 8 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0950 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0673&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB0673.pdf |