TN HB0638 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each governing board of a state institution of higher education to perform a cost-benefit analysis for each institution under the governing board's authority; requires each governing board to report the results of each cost-benefit analysis performed to the education committee of the senate and the education committee of the house of representatives by October 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires each governing board of a state institution of higher education to perform a cost-benefit analysis for each institution under the governing board's authority; requires each governing board to report the results of each cost-benefit analysis performed to the education committee of the senate and the education committee of the house of representatives by October 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1240 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee