TN SB1240 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each governing board of a state institution of higher education to perform a cost-benefit analysis for each institution under the governing board's authority; requires each governing board to report the results of each cost-benefit analysis performed to the education committee of the senate and the education committee of the house of representatives by October 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires each governing board of a state institution of higher education to perform a cost-benefit analysis for each institution under the governing board's authority; requires each governing board to report the results of each cost-benefit analysis performed to the education committee of the senate and the education committee of the house of representatives by October 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0638 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Def. to Summer Study in Higher Education Subcommittee