TN HB0628 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts local jurisdictions that have an established codes department from audit of its records and transactions by the state fire marshal; removes provision of law stating that state building codes supersede all less stringent provisions of municipal ordinances. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120.
Title
As introduced, exempts local jurisdictions that have an established codes department from audit of its records and transactions by the state fire marshal; removes provision of law stating that state building codes supersede all less stringent provisions of municipal ordinances. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] | Rep. Curry Todd [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Steve McManus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2016 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0620 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0628&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0628.pdf |