TN HB0613 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows Woodlake Golf Club to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, allows Woodlake Golf Club to sell alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 136 | |
2011-04-18 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-04-13 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-03-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-16 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0490 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Pub. Ch. 136