TN HB0594 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates Fresh Hospitality located in Nashville as an urban park center for purposes of consumption on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, designates Fresh Hospitality located in Nashville as an urban park center for purposes of consumption on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 273 | |
2017-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0739 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 273