TN HB0590 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Reset on Final cal. of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Reset on Final cal. of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes "the education committee of the house of representatives" to "the education administration committee of the house of representatives" for purposes of determining membership on the board's basic education program (BEP) review committee and identifying the intended recipient of the committee's annual report on the BEP. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the basic education program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Education Administration |
2021-03-31 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1341 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee