TN SB1341 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes "the education committee of the house of representatives" to "the education administration committee of the house of representatives" for purposes of determining membership on the board's basic education program (BEP) review committee and identifying the intended recipient of the committee's annual report on the BEP. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the basic education program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0590 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Reset on Final cal. of Education Administration