TN HB0552 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, states that the goal of the department must be to act in the best interest of the child at all times and that goal must be reflected in any mission statement or motto established by the department. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to the department of children's services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2023 | |
2023-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 305 | |
2023-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-27 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3/30/23 |
2023-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0532 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 305