TN HB0493 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, amends various firearms provisions, including changes to firearms on school property, open or concealed carrying of a firearm, handgun carry permits, and posted firearms prohibitions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 49 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, amends various firearms provisions, including changes to firearms on school property, open or concealed carrying of a firearm, handgun carry permits, and posted firearms prohibitions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 49 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0131 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee