TN SB0131 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, amends various firearms provisions, including changes to firearms on school property, open or concealed carrying of a firearm, handgun carry permits, and posted firearms prohibitions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 49 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, amends various firearms provisions, including changes to firearms on school property, open or concealed carrying of a firearm, handgun carry permits, and posted firearms prohibitions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 49 and Title 70.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017
2017-02-09SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0493 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback