TN HB0483 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing truancy and attendance supervisors. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing truancy and attendance supervisors. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30.
Sponsors
Rep. John Forgety [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0196 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 379