TN HB0479 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a deed for the conveyance of real property be prepared and filed by a licensed attorney or the owner of the property; requires the county register to verify a deed is properly prepared before it is registered and to note the verification on the deed. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 66, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, requires that a deed for the conveyance of real property be prepared and filed by a licensed attorney or the owner of the property; requires the county register to verify a deed is properly prepared before it is registered and to note the verification on the deed. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 66, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1047 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-07 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0479&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0479.pdf |