TN HB0457 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of health to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of health to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 56 | |
2019-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/19 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-25 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0125 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 56