TN HB0301 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a county or city governing body to require the director of schools to face a retention election; prohibits a local board of education from extending the contract of a director of schools if a majority of those voting on the question vote against retaining the director of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes a county or city governing body to require the director of schools to face a retention election; prohibits a local board of education from extending the contract of a director of schools if a majority of those voting on the question vote against retaining the director of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0019 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-19 - Refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback