TN SB0019 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-19 - Refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a county or city governing body to require the director of schools to face a retention election; prohibits a local board of education from extending the contract of a director of schools if a majority of those voting on the question vote against retaining the director of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes a county or city governing body to require the director of schools to face a retention election; prohibits a local board of education from extending the contract of a director of schools if a majority of those voting on the question vote against retaining the director of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-08SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0301 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback