TN HB0267 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, encourages LEAs to provide an age-appropriate seizure education program to teach students about seizures and seizure disorders; encourages the state board of education to promulgate rules for the development and implementation of seizure education programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, encourages LEAs to provide an age-appropriate seizure education program to teach students about seizures and seizure disorders; encourages the state board of education to promulgate rules for the development and implementation of seizure education programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 3, PNV 0
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/3/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0273 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Failed in Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback