TN SB0273 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, encourages LEAs to provide an age-appropriate seizure education program to teach students about seizures and seizure disorders; encourages the state board of education to promulgate rules for the development and implementation of seizure education programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, encourages LEAs to provide an age-appropriate seizure education program to teach students about seizures and seizure disorders; encourages the state board of education to promulgate rules for the development and implementation of seizure education programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Education Committee (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateFailed in Senate Education Committee
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0267 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback