TN HB0267 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows local school districts to train and employ auxiliary police officers to serve as school resource officers and allows them to work more than 100 hours a month without being classified as full-time status if employed in that capacity. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, allows local school districts to train and employ auxiliary police officers to serve as school resource officers and allows them to work more than 100 hours a month without being classified as full-time status if employed in that capacity. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to the SRO Calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0271 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.