TN SB0271 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows local school districts to train and employ auxiliary police officers to serve as school resource officers and allows them to work more than 100 hours a month without being classified as full-time status if employed in that capacity. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, allows local school districts to train and employ auxiliary police officers to serve as school resource officers and allows them to work more than 100 hours a month without being classified as full-time status if employed in that capacity. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0267 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-09 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0271&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0271.pdf |