TN HB0248 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an LEA that has one or more school buses operating in the LEA with a camera or video camera installed inside a school bus that is used to transport students to and from school or school-sponsored activities to adopt a policy that establishes a process to allow a parent, guardian, or person having custody of a student to view photographs or video footage collected from the camera. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires an LEA that has one or more school buses operating in the LEA with a camera or video camera installed inside a school bus that is used to transport students to and from school or school-sponsored activities to adopt a policy that establishes a process to allow a parent, guardian, or person having custody of a student to view photographs or video footage collected from the camera. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256 | |
2019-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0182 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 256