TN SB0182 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an LEA that has one or more school buses operating in the LEA with a camera or video camera installed inside a school bus that is used to transport students to and from school or school-sponsored activities to adopt a policy that establishes a process to allow a parent, guardian, or person having custody of a student to view photographs or video footage collected from the camera. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires an LEA that has one or more school buses operating in the LEA with a camera or video camera installed inside a school bus that is used to transport students to and from school or school-sponsored activities to adopt a policy that establishes a process to allow a parent, guardian, or person having custody of a student to view photographs or video footage collected from the camera. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 256 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019; 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0321) |
2019-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0194) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0248 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256