TN HB0247 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, redefines the premises for Dancing Bear Lodge in Townsend for the purpose of serving and selling alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102(26).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, redefines the premises for Dancing Bear Lodge in Townsend for the purpose of serving and selling alcoholic beverages for consumption on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102(26).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-13 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 70
2015-03-23HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-03-19HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2015
2015-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015
2015-03-12HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar
2015-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015
2015-03-10HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-03-04HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/10/2015
2015-03-03HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to 3/10/2015
2015-02-25HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/3/2015
2015-02-25HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2015-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/25/2015
2015-02-18HouseMeeting Cancelled. Reset on State Government Subcommittee cal. for next meeting.
2015-02-11HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/18/2015
2015-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2015-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2015-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-03HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0406 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 70

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback