TN HB0213 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a scrap metal processor to run a vehicle number identification (VIN) report before shredding a motor vehicle in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 55-3-202.
Title
As introduced, requires a scrap metal processor to run a vehicle number identification (VIN) report before shredding a motor vehicle in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 55-3-202.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Hall [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0075 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans & Safety Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0213&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0213.pdf |