TN HB0210 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Choice and Opportunity Scholarship Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Choice and Opportunity Scholarship Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] |
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning--Government Operations for review |
2015-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0122 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0210&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0210.pdf |