TN SB0122 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Choice and Opportunity Scholarship Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Choice and Opportunity Scholarship Act." - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Ronald Ramsey [R] |
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/11/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0210 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-12 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.