TN HB0201 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the board of trustees of the college savings trust fund program to June 30, 2029. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 8, relative to the board of trustees of the college savings trust fund program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5 | |
2023-02-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-02-09 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/13/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/9/2023 |
2023-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/6/2023 |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0035 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/06/2023