TN HB0201 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Failed for lack of motion in: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Failed for lack of motion in: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits transfers from the motorcycle rider safety fund to the general fund in fiscal years beginning July 1, 2014, and thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Title 55, Chapter 51, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, prohibits transfers from the motorcycle rider safety fund to the general fund in fiscal years beginning July 1, 2014, and thereafter. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Title 55, Chapter 51, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0315 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0201&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0201.pdf |