TN HB0194 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 289
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts "The Workers' Compensation Reform Act of 2013." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 14; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 4; Title 29, Chapter 20, Part 4; Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 2 and Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts "The Workers' Compensation Reform Act of 2013." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 14; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 4; Title 29, Chapter 20, Part 4; Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 2 and Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Consumer and Human Resources Co (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07HouseComp. became Pub. Ch. 289
2013-04-11HouseComp. SB subst.
2013-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2013
2013-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2013
2013-04-02HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/2/2013
2013-03-27HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2013-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2013
2013-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2013-03-19HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2013-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/19/2013
2013-03-12HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
2013-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/12/2013
2013-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2013-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
2013-02-04HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2013-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2013-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-01-28HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0200 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-07 - Pub. Ch. 289

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback