TN SB0200 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pub. Ch. 289
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts "The Workers' Compensation Reform Act of 2013." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 14; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 4; Title 29, Chapter 20, Part 4; Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 2 and Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts "The Workers' Compensation Reform Act of 2013." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 14; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 3; Title 9, Chapter 8, Part 4; Title 29, Chapter 20, Part 4; Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 1; Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 2 and Title 50, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 14 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 15 BY Turner M PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 12 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Turner M PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 16 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Govt. Ops. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07HousePub. Ch. 289
2013-05-07HouseEffective date(s) 04/29/2013; 07/01/2014
2013-04-29HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-18HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-18HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-17HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-15HouseS. concurred in H. am. 14
2013-04-15HouseS. concurred in H. am. 2
2013-04-11HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
2013-04-11HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 24
2013-04-11HouseAm. 15 tabled.
2013-04-11HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 14 of 0 - HA0435)
2013-04-11HouseAm. 12 tabled.
2013-04-11HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 13 - HA0416)
2013-04-11HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 11 - HA0412)
2013-04-11HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 10 - HA0411)
2013-04-11HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 9 - HA0410)
2013-04-11HouseAm. 4-8 tabled.
2013-04-11HouseAm. 3 failed
2013-04-11HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0272)
2013-04-11HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0114)
2013-04-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-04-03SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-04-01SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 28, Nays 2
2013-04-01SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA0245)
2013-04-01SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0178)
2013-04-01SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0123)
2013-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013
2013-03-26SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
2013-03-20SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013
2013-03-12SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-03-07SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-28SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0194 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 289

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback